GA SB222 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Conyers, approved March 16, 1978 (Ga. L. 1978, p. 3868), as amended specifically by an Act approved March 20, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4032), so as to repeal certain provisions relating to the election and terms of office of the mayor and councilmembers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Conyers, City of; election/term of office of the mayor and councilmembers; repeal certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #128 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #128 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 43 | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |