GA SB22 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Effective Date 2021-03-08
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Effective Date 2021-03-08
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for a new Board of Commissioners of Henry County, approved March 28, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 3680), as amended, so as to provide a code of ethics; to establish a board of ethics; to revise the authority, roles, and responsibilities of the chairperson, the board of commissioners, and the county manager; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Henry County; a code of ethics; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #164 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #184 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #75 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #184 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #75 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Effective Date 2021-03-08 | |
2021-03-08 | Act 4 | |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-08 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |