GA SB169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 10 of Title 13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding contracts for public works, Code Section 32-2-70 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bonds of successful bidder, and Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 91 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bonds generally, so as to provide for acceptance of electronic signatures and electronic corporate seals on bonds; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bonds; acceptance of electronic signatures and electronic corporate seals on bonds; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #266 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #98 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #98 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 215 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |