GA SB167 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-9-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to levy of motor fuel excise tax, so as to exempt public school systems from motor fuel excise taxes under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxes; exempt public school systems from motor fuel excise taxes under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Tim Golden [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Doug Stoner [D] |
Sen. Curt Thompson [D] | Sen. Stephen Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-18 | Senate Read and Referred |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/27114 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/sb167_As_introduced_LC_28_4439_3.htm |