GA SB163 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Human Resources, so as to authorize the commissioner of human resources to appoint a diabetes coordinator; to provide for the department to serve as the central repository of diabetes treatment and prevention data; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Human Resources Commissioner; authorize to appoint a diabetes coordinator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #408 - Pass (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #117 - Passage As Amended (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #117 - Passage As Amended (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-01 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-17 | Senate Read and Referred |