GA SB156 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency telephone number 9-1-1 system, so as to remove the requirements for certain audits; to require certain reports; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Emergency Telephone Number 9-1-1 System; remove the requirements for certain audits; certain reports
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #383 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #359 - Agree To House Amendment As Amended (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #278 - Passage (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #132 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #359 - Agree To House Amendment As Amended (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #278 - Passage (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #132 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 187 | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Read and Referred |