GA SB154 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a supplemental salary for the judges of the Superior Court of the Coweta Judicial Circuit, approved December 11, 1953 (Ga. L. 1953, Nov.-Dec. Sess., p. 92), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 2, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 4254), so as to change the supplemental salaries for such judges; to provide for the apportionment of such supplement among the counties in the circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior Court of the Coweta Judicial Circuit; judges; change supplemental salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-18 - House - House Vote #292 - Local Calendar (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #74 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #74 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-06 | Act 211 | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-03 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-26 | House First Readers | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-17 | Senate Read and Referred |