GA SB127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 9 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor fuel tax, so as to require electronic filing of certain reports; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax; electronic filing of certain reports; require
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #301 (Y: 157 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #75 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #75 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 298 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |