GA SB117 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 25 of the O.C.G.A., relating to blasting or excavating near utility facilities, so as to revise and add definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Blasting or Excavating Near Utility Facilities; revise/add definitions
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House Vote #722 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #40 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #40 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-24 | Act 610 | |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |