GA SB106 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Chatham Area Transit Authority, approved March 28, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 5082), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 24, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 4824), and an Act approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5296), so as to reconstitute the Chatham Area Transit Authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham Area Transit Authority; reconstitute the Chatham Area Transit Authority; provide for additional members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43660 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/147654 |