GA SB105 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 2 of Title 18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Uniform Fraudulent Transfers Act," so as to provide for a definition; to provide that a charitable contribution made to a charitable organization shall not be deemed a fraudulent transfer when the charitable organization receives such contribution in good faith; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Uniform Fraudulent Transfers Act"; provide for a definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #395 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #354 (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #73 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #354 (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #73 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 328 | |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |