GA SB1 | 2023 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Effective Date 2023-12-08
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Effective Date 2023-12-08
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the composition and number of state senatorial districts; to provide for a short title; to provide for the contingent nature of this Act and the circumstances under which it shall or shall not apply, according to the enforceability of prior provisions under federal law; to provide for the continuation of present Senators; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Senate Redistricting Act of 2023"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Echols [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #13 (Y: 98 N: 71 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-12-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #12 (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #11 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #12 (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #11 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Effective Date 2023-12-08 | |
2023-12-08 | Act 1EX | |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-12-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-12-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-12-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-12-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-12-01 | House | House First Readers |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |