GA HR612 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Fibroids Education and Awareness; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Fibroids Education and Awareness; create
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Nikki Randall [D] | Rep. Valerie Clark [R] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] |
Rep. Pam Stephenson [D] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #326 (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44542 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/150629 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44542#12721 |