GA HR531 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that funds derived from sales and use and motor fuel taxes with respect to jet fuel and aviation gasoline shall be allocated for activities incident to providing and maintaining an adequate system of public-use airports in this state; to authorize the General Assembly to specify and direct the use of such funds by general law; to provide for submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor fuel sales tax; allocated to public-use airports; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39426 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/132801 |