GA HR29 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION compensating Mr. Jakeith Bendray Robinson, Sr.; and for other purposes.
Title
Robinson, Mr. Jakeith Bendray, Sr.; compensate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Adopt: House Vote #205 (Y: 133 N: 29 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58965 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/195880 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58965#18419 |