GA HR215 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life and memory of the Honorable Ronald Lee Newton and dedicating a road in his honor; and for other purposes.
Title
Judge Ronald L. Newton Memorial Highway; Fannin County; dedicate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #268 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #225 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #225 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 311 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House Hopper |