GA HR184 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Committee Unfavorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Committee Unfavorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for pari-mutuel betting on horse racing; to provide for the disposition of licensing and taxation revenues from such activities; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; provide by law for pari-mutuel betting on horse racing; authorize - CA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Unfavorably Reported |
2021-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59846 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198102 |