GA HR182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION authorizing the granting of non-exclusive easements for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities, utilities, roads, and ingress and egress in, on, over, under, upon, across, or through property owned by the State of Georgia in Barrow, Camden, Cobb, Floyd, Houston, and White Counties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; granting of non-exclusive easements; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #390 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #131 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Vote #45 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 307
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-05SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-20HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-20HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback