GA HR141 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Expanding Long-Term Care Options; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Expanding Long-Term Care Options; create
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] |
Rep. Rick Townsend [R] | Rep. John LaHood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House Hopper |