GA HR1398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Short-Term Rental Providers; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Short-Term Rental Providers; create
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #761 (Y: 142 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53395 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/175505 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53395#16127 |