GA HR1376 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the modification of a ground lease on state owned real property in Baldwin County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Carroll County; authorizing the conveyance of and an easement on certain state owned real property located in Clinch County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Coffee County; authorizing the conveyance and acquisition by exchange of certain state owned real property located in Dade County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Dodge County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Dougherty County; to provide an effective date; and for other purposes.
Title
Conveyance of certain property; Baldwin, Carroll, Clinch, Coffee, and other counties; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Billy Horne [R] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #869 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #816 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #558 - Adopt (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #816 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #558 - Adopt (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 759 | |
2012-05-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |