GA HR1257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on the Workforce Shortage and Crisis in Home and Community Based Settings; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on the Workforce Shortage and Crisis in Home and Community Based Settings; create
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] |
Rep. John LaHood [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #775 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53118 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/174395 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53118#16170 |