GA HR1162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the following commercial public facilities to have at least one gender neutral adult changing station with an adult changing table and appropriate signage: facilities with an occupant load greater than 1,000 people (if obtaining a permit for construction or renovation on or after January 1, 2021), facilities under the jurisdiction of the Safety Fire Commissioner, and facilities under the jurisdiction of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Certain commercial public facilities; have at least one gender neutral adult changing station with an adult changing table and appropriate signage; urge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57369 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189946 |