GA HB99 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for modernization and updates; to amend various provisions for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; provide for modernization and updates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #391 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #388 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #423 (Y: 89 N: 69 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #424 (Y: 102 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #425 (Y: 97 N: 60 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #58 (Y: 149 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Receded from Amend or Sub
2019-04-02HouseHouse Reconsidered
2019-04-02HouseHouse Insisted
2019-04-02SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-04-02SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-05HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/99
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/180103.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182081.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182484.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/184771.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/186852.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187558.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16562
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17255
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17254
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17253
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17218
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17281

Bill Comments

feedback