GA HB965 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), as amended, so as to require review of ordinances by committees prior to adoption; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; review of ordinances by committees prior to adoption; require
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Marie Metze [D] |
Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Vote #479 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57552 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190427 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57552#17420 |