GA HB957 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to continue the charter for the Academy of Social Circle and to create a body politic known as the School District of Social Circle, approved April 29, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 4557), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office of the current members of the board of education; to provide for the submission of this Act for preclearance under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social Circle, City of; School District; change description of education districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #574 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #550 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #550 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-13 | Act 370 | |
2012-03-13 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-15 | House First Readers |