GA HB954 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to abortion, so as to change certain provisions relating to criminal abortion; to change certain provisions relating to when abortion is legal; to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to define certain terms; to require a determination of gestational age prior to abortion; to provide for certain reporting requirements with respect to performance of abortions; to state legislative findings; to provide for other related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Abortion; criminal abortion; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Douglas McKillip [D] |
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #868 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 106 N: 59 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #883 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #882 - Motion For The Previous Question (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #697 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #696 - Adoption Of Amendment #9 By Senator From The 11th To Committee Sub (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #695 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 55th To Committee Sub (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - House Vote #579 - Passage (Y: 102 N: 65 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #883 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #882 - Motion For The Previous Question (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #697 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #696 - Adoption Of Amendment #9 By Senator From The 11th To Committee Sub (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #695 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 55th To Committee Sub (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - House Vote #579 - Passage (Y: 102 N: 65 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 631 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-29 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-29 | House Insists | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Insists | |
2012-03-27 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-29 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-27 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-15 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-09 | House First Readers |