GA HB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to solid waste management, so as to provide for safe disposal of coal ash in municipal solid waste and commercial industrial solid waste landfills; to provide for definitions; to provide requirements for siting new or expanded landfills receiving coal combustion residuals; to provide for such landfills permitted prior to July 1, 2019; to provide for ground-water detection monitoring; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid waste management; safe disposal of coal ash in municipal solid waste and commercial industrial solid waste landfills; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54451 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/180040 |