GA HB934 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to revise the tax credit for adoption of foster children; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; adoption of foster children; revise tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |