GA HB934 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that future elections for the office of chief judge of the Magistrate Court of Thomas County shall be nonpartisan elections; to provide for the sitting chief judge of the magistrate court to serve out his or her term of office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Thomas County; Magistrate Court chief judge; provide nonpartisan elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #584 (Y: 112 N: 50 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #584 (Y: 112 N: 50 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 396 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hopper |