GA HB933 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use taxes, so as to remove the sunset for the exemption regarding the sale or use of certain property used in the maintenance or repair of certain aircraft; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; regarding sale or use of certain property used in maintenance or repair of certain aircraft; remove sunset exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #843 (Y: 156 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #617 (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #668 (Y: 163 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #617 (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #668 (Y: 163 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-24 | Act 606 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Hopper |