GA HB916 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-7.4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bona fide conservation use property, so as to change certain qualifications and restrictions regarding covenants; to provide for exceptions; to provide for a definition; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bona fide conservation use property; covenants; change certain qualifications and restrictions
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Sen. John Bulloch [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #839 - Agree Sen Ams (Y: 154 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #713 - Passage As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #602 - Passage (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #713 - Passage As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #602 - Passage (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 680 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-07 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-06 | House First Readers |