GA HB91 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the elementary and secondary education, so as to eliminate the Georgia High School Graduation Test as a requirement for purposes of graduation; to provide procedures for former students who did not pass one or more portions of the Georgia High School Graduation Test to petition to obtain a high school diploma; to provide for notice of such petition option; to provide for changes for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; eliminate Georgia High School Graduation Test as a requirement for graduation; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #205 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #32 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30 Effective Date
2015-03-30 Act 14
2015-03-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2015-03-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2015-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2015-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2015-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-03-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2015-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-02-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2015-02-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-01-27HouseHouse First Readers
2015-01-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback