GA HB877 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for standards for issuance of a Georgia certificate of title for certain motor vehicles converted from original manufacturer condition in order to comply with certain state and federal requirements; to provide for exceptions to certain federal standards for such motor vehicles; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; standards for issuance of a Georgia certificate of title for certain motor vehicles; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Jeff Jones [R] | Rep. Danny Mathis [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #734 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #545 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #545 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 498 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House Hopper |