GA HB870 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to horns, exhaust systems, mirrors, windshields, tires, safety belts, and energy absorption systems, so as to prohibit the installation of tires upon passenger vehicles which do not meet certain standards; to provide for applicability; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibit installation of tires upon passenger vehicles which do not meet certain standards
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House Hopper |