GA HB86 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide that returns of absentee ballots shall be made by precinct; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; absentee ballots; returns be made by precinct; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #351 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House Vote #127 - Pass (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-01 Effective Date
2009-04-30 Act 71
2009-04-30 House Date Signed by Governor
2009-04-13 House Sent to Governor
2009-04-01 Senate Passed/Adopted
2009-04-01 Senate Third Read
2009-03-23 Senate Read Second Time
2009-03-20 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2009-03-05 Senate Read and Referred
2009-03-04 House Passed/Adopted
2009-03-04 House Third Readers
2009-02-24 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-01-16 House Second Readers
2009-01-15 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback