GA HB858 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to drivers' licenses, so as to provide for the issuance of an alternative state identification card by the Department of Driver Services; to provide for application standards and required documentation for issuance of such identification cards; to provide for contents and format for such identification cards; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; issuance of an alternative state identification card by the Department of Driver Services; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Hopper |
2023-11-30 | House | House Prefiled |