GA HB858 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 16 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Uniform Civil Forfeiture Procedure Act, so as to provide for hearings upon the seizure of certain property; to provide that certain properties shall not be subject to forfeiture; to provide for a definition; to provide for criteria; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Innocent Georgian Process Improvement Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Viola Davis [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Rep. David Dreyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Hopper |
2021-11-22 | House | House Prefiled |