GA HB847 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 23 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hemp farming, so as to provide definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for criminal background checks; to provide for compliance with federal laws and regulations; to provide for hemp nursery licensees; to provide for license and permit fees; to provide for testing of hemp samples; to provide for destruction of noncompliant hemp; to provide for violations of the state hemp plan; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hemp farming; definitions, penalties and criminal background checks; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #674 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Vote #532 (Y: 159 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22 Effective Date
2020-07-22 Act 484
2020-07-22HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-22SenateSenate Transmitted House
2020-06-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-22SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2020-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback