GA HB843 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-40.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax credits for business enterprises in less developed areas, so as to include any census tract that in a county that contains a certain federal military installation and also contains an industrial park that is owned and operated by a governmental entity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; tax credits; include any census tract in a county that contains a federal military installation and industrial park

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #651 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #646 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 378
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-21SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback