GA HB836 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Dougherty County School System, approved February 5, 1951 (Ga. L. 1951, p. 2233), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 11, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 3843), so as to change the compensation of members of the board of education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dougherty County School System; change compensation of members of the board of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 374 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House Hopper |