GA HB824 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to financing under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to revise the method of calculating equalization grants; to add an eligibility requirement; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; calculating equalization grants; revise method
Sponsors
Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] |
Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #850 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 101 N: 63 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #708 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House Vote #497 - Passage (Y: 143 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #708 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House Vote #497 - Passage (Y: 143 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-19 | Act 620 | |
2012-04-19 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-31 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-30 | House First Readers |