GA HB802 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the compensation and expense of the members of the Board of Education of Calhoun County, approved April 1, 1996 (Ga. L. 1996, p. 3838), so as to modify the compensation of the members of the board of education; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Calhoun County; Board of Education; modify compensation of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #659 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Vote #444 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Vote #444 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 358 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-01-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |