GA HB796 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the Byron Convention and Visitors Bureau Authority, approved April 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3921), so as to change the composition of the authority; to change the manner of appointment; to provide for terms; to provide for staff; to provide for meetings; to provide for duties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Byron Convention and Visitors Bureau Authority; composition of authority; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #342 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - House Vote #335 - Local Calendar (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - House Vote #335 - Local Calendar (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 297 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-26 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2009-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-25 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-23 | House First Readers |