GA HB791 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 26-4-80 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to license required for practice of pharmacy, dispensing prescription drugs, prescription drug orders, electronically transmitting drug orders, refills, and Schedule II controlled substance prescriptions, so as to authorize a pharmacist to dispense up to a 90 day supply of a maintenance medication under certain conditions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pharmacists; dispense up to a 90 day supply of a maintenance medication under certain conditions; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #753 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #680 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #561 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #680 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #561 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 590 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House Hopper |