GA HB774 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Veto V10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Veto V10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Irwin County, approved February 16, 1933 (Ga. L. 1933, p. 571), as amended, so as to revise provisions related to the compensation of the board of commissioners; to revise provisions relating to appointment of the clerk of the board of commissioners; to provide for the appointment of a county administrator; to provide for the powers and duties of the county administrator; to revise provisions relating to the superintendent of roads and bridges; to repeal provisions relating to providing an automobile to the chairperson when serving as superintendent of roads and bridges; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Irwin County; Board of Commissioners; compensation; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #296 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Veto V10 | |
2023-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-31 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House Hopper |