GA HB770 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-5-46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to trafficking of persons for labor or sexual servitude, so as to provide for and revise defined terms; to change penalty provisions; to remove a potential defense to a charge of trafficking of persons for labor or sexual servitude; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; trafficking of persons for labor or sexual servitude; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] |
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #635 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote #612 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote #612 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 441 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House Hopper |