GA HB747 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-1-8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to safe operation of motor carriers and commercial motor vehicles, so as to update the reference date to federal regulations regarding the safe operation of motor carriers and commercial motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; safe operation of motor carriers and commercial motor vehicles; update reference date to federal regulations
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #597 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #491 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #491 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 437 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hopper |