GA HB739 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide that the state recommendation process for instructional materials and content is optional; to require a review and recommendation process for locally approved instructional materials and content; to provide for public review of proposed and approved instructional materials and content; to provide for the designation of a school system coordinator; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elementary and secondary education; process for state approved instructional materials and content is optional; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #608 (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Vote #511 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Vote #511 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 523 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House Hopper |