GA HB729 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to define the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to provide that certain corporate income tax elections made for federal income tax purposes shall also apply for state income tax purposes; to provide an effective date; to provide applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Internal Revenue and Internal Revenue Code of 1986; define terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #824 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #625 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #623 - Motion To Engross (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Vote #482 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #625 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #623 - Motion To Engross (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Vote #482 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 664 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Engrossed | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-15 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-07 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-13 | House First Readers |